Global Patent Index - EP 0975056 A2

EP 0975056 A2 2000-01-26 - Electrical connector terminal and electrical connector with same

Title (en)

Electrical connector terminal and electrical connector with same

Title (de)

Elektrischer Endkontakt und mit diesem Verbinder

Title (fr)

Pièce terminale électrique et connecteur la contenant

Publication

EP 0975056 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114373 A

Priority

JP 22547698 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is adapted to provide an improved terminal for use in electrical connectors, with the preferred embodiment of the connector being a double pole electrical connector having a reduced number of parts, and a construction adapted for reducing the overall length of the electrical connector in the forward and rear direction. The double pole electrical connector comprises and insulative housing, two conductive terminals arranged in parallel relationship along the forward and rear direction of the insulative housing, and fitting nails outwardly extending from both side surfaces of the insulative housing in generally flush arrangement with a bottom surface of the insulative housing. The fitting nails are soldered to simultaneously establish connection between the conductive terminals and an external circuit, and fixing of the insulative housing to the substrate containing the external circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 12/55 (2011.01); H01R 12/57 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/7076 (2013.01); H01R 13/41 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975056 A2 20000126; EP 0975056 A3 20010214; JP 2000048883 A 20000218; TW 423736 U 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020821

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020814

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI