Global patent index - EP 0975057 A1

EP 0975057 A1 2000-01-26 - Contact piece for female connector and connector comprising such a contact piece

Title (en)

Contact piece for female connector and connector comprising such a contact piece

Title (de)

Kontaktteil für Verbindungsbuchse und Verbinder mit einem solchen Kontaktteil

Title (fr)

"Piece de contact pour connecteur femelle, et connecteur comportant une telle piece de contact"

Publication

EP 0975057 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401803 A

Priority

FR 9809347 A

Abstract (en)

The contact has inwardly folded side wings with projecting tabs ensuring their support on central base plate. The contact piece for a female connector comprises a cage with a central panel (4a) and two side panels (4b,4c). A connection part (7) is formed by two extended terminals (7a,7b) which lie in the plane of the central panel and extend from it. Two contact lamellae (5,6) are formed from inwardly folded projections of the two side panels (4b,4c), such that they present a narrow region between them for insertion of the male terminal. Each contact lamella has a projecting peg (5a,6a) which engages a slot formed in the center of the central panel. The two contact lamella offer a spring pressure in order to grip the inserted male terminal.

Abstract (fr)

Cette pièce de contact (1), pour connecteur femelle, comprend une cage (4) ayant une paroi médiane rectangulaire (4a) et deux ailes latérales (4b,4c), une partie de connexion (7) raccordée d'un seul tenant à une extrémité de la cage et deux lames de contact (5,6) qui sont raccordées d'un seul tenant respectivement aux ailes latérales (4b,4c), sur un côté de celles-ci situé du même côté que la partie de connexion (7), et repliées à l'intérieur de la cage (4) de manière à converger vers le plan médian longitudinal de celle-ci. La paroi médiane (4a) présente, à peu près en son milieu, une bande (12) qui fait saillie dans la cage, et chaque lame de contact (5,6) présente sur son côté longitudinal qui est tourné vers la paroi médiane de la cage, un ergot (5a,6a) qui prend élastiquement appui sur un côté de ladite bande (12), cette dernière ayant une largeur prédéfinie l de manière à maintenir un écartement prédéfini correspondant entre les lames de contact (5,6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/11; H01R 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/55 (2011.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975057 A1 20000126; EP 0975057 B1 20021002; DE 69903231 D1 20021107; DE 69903231 T2 20030618; ES 2182465 T3 20030301; FR 2781611 A1 20000128; FR 2781611 B1 20001006

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030721

2004-03-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030719

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030719

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182465

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903231

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000221

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI