Global patent index - EP 0975058 A2

EP 0975058 A2 2000-01-26 - Contact device

Title (en)

Contact device

Title (de)

Kontaktvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contact

Publication

EP 0975058 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114194 A

Priority

DE 29813239 U

Abstract (en)

The contact device has a pair of elastic contact elements Ä1,2Ü that are normally separated by spacer elements Ä4Ü set at different intervals. One of the contacts is supported on a surface Ä10Ü and the contact ends are coupled to a cable Ä1',2'Ü. An actuator above the top contact operates at points between the spacer elements and when a force is applied the contacts are brought into engagement.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines elektrischen Kontaktes, insbesondere tut die Anordnung in Kraftfahrzeuglenkrädern, mit einem ersten, im wesentlichen feststehenden Kontaktelement, einem zweiten, gegen eine Rückstellkraft beweglichen Kontaktelement sowie mit einer Betätigungseinrichtung. Die Vorrichtung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Kontaktelemente (1, 2) aus langgestreckten draht- oder bandförmigen Materialabschnitten bestehen, die in einem Käfig (3) parallel zueinander definiert beabstandet gehalten werden, wobei in Längsrichtung gesehen abwechselnd Bereiche (4) starrer Abstandshalterung und Bereiche (5) vorgesehen sind, in denen das zweite Kontaktelement (2) mittels einer Betätigungseinrichtung (6) unter elastischer Verformung des Materialabschnitts gegen das erste Kontaktelement (1) andrückbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/24; H01R 13/703

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H01H 1/24 (2006.01); H01H 13/18 (2006.01); H01H 13/52 (2006.01); H01H 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/24 (2013.01); H01H 3/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813239 U1 19981001; DE 59914115 D1 20070215; EP 0975058 A2 20000126; EP 0975058 A3 20010801; EP 0975058 B1 20070103; JP 2000048674 A 20000218; US 6365853 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070824

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-08-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-04-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59914115

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20070215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYSTEMS GMBH

2002-06-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/24 A, 7H 01R 13/703 B, 7H 01H 3/14 B, 7B 60Q 1/14 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI