Global patent index - EP 0975068 A2

EP 0975068 A2 2000-01-26 - Dubbel electrical socket

Title (en)

Dubbel electrical socket

Title (de)

Elektrische Doppelsteckdose

Title (fr)

Prise électrique double

Publication

EP 0975068 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111180 A

Priority

DE 19832741 A

Abstract (en)

Two earthed wire bow collectors (12,14) are pressed out from flat material, then bent and connected by a bridge plate (16) to each other so as to be conductive. The double earthed wire bow collector (10) so formed is fastened to both bases, forming two single bow collectors with contact legs (11,13) connected to each other by a connecting bridge (15).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Doppelsteckdose mit je einem einer jeden Steckdose zugeordneten Sockel mit einem daran gehaltenen U-förmigen Schutzleiterkontaktbügel (12, 14) mit Kontaktschenkeln (11, 13) aus elektrisch leitendem Metall, wobei die Schutzleiterkontaktbügel (12, 14) aus Flachmaterial ausgestanzt, gebogen und mit dem der benachbarten Steckdose zugeordneten Schutzleiterkontaktbügel I (12, 14) leitend verbunden sind und der so gefertigte Doppel-Schutzleiterkontaktbügel (10) an beiden Sockeln befestigt ist, wobei der Doppel-Schutzleiterkontaktbügel (10) aus zwei baugleichen Einzel-Schutzleiterkontaktbügeln (12, 14) gebildet ist, die je einen geraden und einen gekröpften, durch einen Verbindungssteg (15) miteinander verbundenen Kontaktschenkel (11, 13) aufweisen, wobei ferner deren gerade Kontaktschenkel jeweils einander benachbart angeordnet sind und zur Verbindung der beiden Einzel-Schutzleiterkontaktbügel (12, 14) ein Brückenteil (16) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/12; H01R 24/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 13/652 (2006.01); H01R 13/655 (2006.01); H01R 24/78 (2011.01); H01R 25/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H01R (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/78 (2013.01); H01R 13/655 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975068 A2 20000126; EP 0975068 A3 20020313; EP 0975068 B1 20030507; DE 19832741 A1 20000127; NO 316854 B1 20040601; NO 993553 A 20000124; NO 993553 D0 19990720

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0975068E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905416

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL SE

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/06 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/16 B

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI NL SE

2002-08-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DOUBLE ELECTRICAL SOCKET

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 24/12 A, 7H 01R 24/16 B, 7H 01R 19/42 B

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL SE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI