Global patent index - EP 0975069 A2

EP 0975069 A2 2000-01-26 - Safety holder system for lamps

Title (en)

Safety holder system for lamps

Title (de)

Berührungssicheres Sockel-/ Fassungssystem für Leuchten

Title (fr)

Système de douille / support de sécurité pour lampes

Publication

EP 0975069 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113980 A

Priority

DE 19832352 A

Abstract (en)

A multipin cap (1) has pins (3) fitted to a front face (15) and a holder with holes on the front face to take the pins. A lug (11) is fixed to a guide section (6) in the cap for a corresponding slot in the holder. The cap's guide section and the holder's guide section have centering shoulders (8) at an open end.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum leichteren Einsetzen von Stiftsockeln in Fassungen, mittels formschlüssigen Führungsprofilen, die gleichzeitig zum Codieren benützt werden, um das Einsetzen von Lampen in nicht dazu geeignete Fassungen zu verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/76; H01R 13/44; H01R 13/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/76 (2006.01); H01R 13/44 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/7657 (2013.01); H01R 13/44 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975069 A2 20000126; EP 0975069 A3 20020306; DE 19832352 A1 20000127; US 6250947 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029228

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020907

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI