Global patent index - EP 0975072 A2

EP 0975072 A2 2000-01-26 - Apparatus with an optical functional device having a special wiring electrode

Title (en)

Apparatus with an optical functional device having a special wiring electrode

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit einer optischen Funktion und speziellen Verbindungselektroden

Title (fr)

Dispositif ayant une fonction optique avec des électrodes d'interconnexion spéciales

Publication

EP 0975072 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114364 A

Priority

  • JP 22228698 A
  • JP 22650998 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus with an optical functional device includes a first substrate (1, 51, 201, 271), a first optical functional device with a functional portion (8, 208 ) provided on the first substrate, a first wiring electrode (6, 106, 206) for injecting a current into or applying a voltage to the functional portion of the first optical functional device, a second substrate (10, 71, 110, 160, 170, 180, 210, 250, 260), and a second wiring electrode (12, 68, 72, 81, 112, 213). The first wiring electrode (6, 106, 206) is formed on the first substrate (1, 51, 201, 271) and includes a first portion electrically connected to the functional portion (8, 208 ), a first extension portion extending from the first portion to an outside of the functional portion and a first pad portion connected to the extension portion outside the functional portion, and the second wiring electrode (12, 68, 72, 81, 112, 213) is formed on the second substrate (10, 71, 110, 160, 170, 180, 210, 250, 260) and includes a second pad portion and a second extension portion extending from the second pad portion. The first substrate and the second substrate are bonded to each other with the first pad portion and the second pad portion being electrically connected to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/02; H01S 5/026

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/02 (2006.01); H01S 5/42 (2006.01); H01S 5/00 (2006.01); H01S 5/0683 (2006.01); H01S 5/183 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/02272 (2013.01); H01S 5/423 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48145 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48463 (2013.01); H01L 2924/10253 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12032 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1305 (2013.01); H01S 5/005 (2013.01); H01S 5/02248 (2013.01); H01S 5/02276 (2013.01); H01S 5/02284 (2013.01); H01S 5/0262 (2013.01); H01S 5/0264 (2013.01); H01S 5/0267 (2013.01); H01S 5/0683 (2013.01); H01S 5/18305 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2924/10253 + H01L 2924/00
  2. H01L 2924/12032 + H01L 2924/00
  3. H01L 2924/1305 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975072 A2 20000126; EP 0975072 A3 20030319; EP 0975072 B1 20050928; DE 69927447 D1 20060209; DE 69927447 T2 20060713; US 2003026303 A1 20030206; US 6597713 B2 20030722

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-11-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061124

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69927447

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-01-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OUCHI, TOSHIHIKO, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI

2005-01-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS WITH AN OPTICAL FUNCTIONAL DEVICE HAVING A SPECIAL WIRING ELECTRODE

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI