Global Patent Index - EP 0975075 A3

EP 0975075 A3 2000-02-02 - A method for producing a spark plug

Title (en)

A method for producing a spark plug

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren einer Zündkerze

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'une bougie d'allumage

Publication

EP 0975075 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99122560 A

Priority

  • EP 97110583 A
  • JP 18834796 A
  • JP 33511996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0817341A1] Spark plug has a central electrode, an insulator provided exterior to the central electrode, main metallic shell provided exterior to the insulator in such a way that the central electrode protrudes from one end, and a ground electrode coupled at one end to the main metallic shell and which has the other end disposed to face the central electrode 3, with a chip being secured to either the central electrode or the ground electrode or both to form spark discharge gap g. The chip is made of a metal based on Ir which contains Rh in an amount ranging from 3 to 50 wt% (50 wt% being not inclusive). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 13/00 (2006.01); C22C 5/04 (2006.01); H01T 13/39 (2006.01); H01T 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 21/02 (2013.01); H01T 13/39 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0817341 A1 19980107; EP 0817341 B1 20000906; EP 0817341 B2 20031210; CN 1059293 C 20001206; CN 1170980 A 19980121; DE 69703011 D1 20001012; DE 69703011 T2 20010111; DE 69703011 T3 20040527; EP 0975075 A2 20000126; EP 0975075 A3 20000202; JP 3461670 B2 20031027; JP H1074575 A 19980317

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030905

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000307

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 817341

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT