Global Patent Index - EP 0975201 A2

EP 0975201 A2 2000-01-26 - A method of processing a plural channel audio signal

Title (en)

A method of processing a plural channel audio signal

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Mehrkanal-Tonsignalverarbeitung

Title (fr)

Procedé de traitement d'un signal audio à plussieurs canaux

Publication

EP 0975201 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305562 A

Priority

GB 9816059 A

Abstract (en)

A method of processing a plural channel audio signal representing a three dimensional sound-field for generation by respective left and right loudspeakers arranged at a given distance from a listener, including:- a) choosing a distance between said loudspeakers and said listener; b) determining from this chosen distance an optimal amount of transaural crosstalk compensation, the optimal amount being a function of the chosen distance; and c) applying said optimal amount of crosstalk compensation to said left and right channels. The optimal transaural crosstalk cancellation is preferably achieved using a near ear response transfer function and a far ear response transfer function which asymptotically approach different values at low frequencies. The method may further include choosing an angle between the left channel loudspeaker and the right channel loudspeaker, and determining from both the chosen angle and the chosen distance an optimal amount of transaural crosstalk compensation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/02 (2006.01); H04R 3/12 (2006.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975201 A2 20000126; EP 0975201 A3 20050608; EP 0975201 B1 20130410; GB 2340005 A 20000209; GB 2340005 B 20030319; GB 9816059 D0 19980923; JP 2000059892 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69944696

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140113

2013-08-28 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-06-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69944696

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2013-04-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CREATIVE TECHNOLOGY LTD.

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI