Global Patent Index - EP 0975242 A1

EP 0975242 A1 2000-02-02 - SHOE-COVERING PROTECTION ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

SHOE-COVERING PROTECTION ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

SCHUHBEDECKENDE SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE PROTECTION RECOUVRANT LA CHAUSSURE

Publication

EP 0975242 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917607 A

Priority

  • IT 9800089 W
  • IT PE970010 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846099A1] A shoe-covering protection assembly which can be worn easily, by enabling at the same time to walk freely on ground in any condition and to be transported easily when not used, comprises an overshoe footwear (1), made of waterproof foldable material, and close-fitting wearing means (15) for adjusting the shape of said overshoe footwear in the insole (6), heel (14), rear vamp (10) and instep regions thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846099A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846099 A1 19981022; AU 7078398 A 19981111; DE 69804599 D1 20020508; EP 0975242 A1 20000202; EP 0975242 B1 20020403; IT 242664 Y1 20020130; IT PE970010 U1 19981019; IT PE970010 V0 19970417

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020703

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804599 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-04-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL