Global patent index - EP 0975247 A1

EP 0975247 A1 2000-02-02 - ARRANGEMENT RELATED TO A CARD KEEPER

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT RELATED TO A CARD KEEPER

Title (de)

HALTEANORDNUNG FÜR EINE KARTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE CARTE

Publication

EP 0975247 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97923377 A

Priority

  • SE 9700778 W
  • SE 9601823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742852A1] A device for holding a perforated object, for instance a perforated card or a key ring. The device includes a first holder unit for coaction with the perforated object, a second holder unit for coaction with a piece of clothing on the person carrying the object, and a reel or winder that acts between the two units. The reel includes a tongue-shaped protrusion from which the line can be fed out from and into the reel. The first holder unit includes a closable hasp which is intended for coaction with the hole in the perforated object. The second holder unit coacts with the reel or winder via a hooked part which is attached to an eyelet on the reel. Coaction between the second holder unit and said clothing is effected with the aid of a clamping device belonging to the second holder unit. The first holder unit includes first and second wing-like protrusions on opposite sides of the holder unit relative to the hasp. These wing-shaped protrusions are adapted so that the tongue-shaped protrusion can be embraced by the two wing-shaped protrusions when the line has been reeled-in, whereby the first holder unit is prevented from twisting or rotating about the axis of the line that extends between the reel and the first holder unit when the line has been taken-up by the reel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 5/02; A44B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 15/00 (2006.01); A45F 5/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/207 (2013.01); A45F 5/004 (2013.01); A44B 15/00 (2013.01); A45F 2200/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9742852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742852 A1 19971120; AU 2919297 A 19971205; EP 0975247 A1 20000202; SE 507703 C2 19980706; SE 9601823 D0 19960513; SE 9601823 L 19971114

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-11-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR HOLDING A PERFORATED OBJECT

2002-05-29 [111L] LICENCES

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111L

- Free Format Text: 20020311 0100 EXPOGRAF CARDKEEP INTERNATIONAL AKTIEBOLAG

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981216

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE