Global Patent Index - EP 0975254 A2

EP 0975254 A2 2000-02-02 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING FOR AN AUTOMATIC CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING FOR AN AUTOMATIC CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

STEUERUNG EINES REINIGUNGSAUTOMATEN

Title (fr)

COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF AUTOMATIQUE DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0975254 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98928133 A

Priority

  • DE 9800957 W
  • DE 19715563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715563A1] According to the inventive method for controlling an automatic cleaning device used for cleaning the surface of a window, the cleaning head is first advanced onto the window surface, approximately in the center or close to the edge, by means of a powered control system. This starting position is determined using the basic information for the building concerned provided in the plans of the building. The cleaning head is subsequently moved over the window surface as far as the window frame in direction X or Z, in a first seek-edges-mode, then moved along the window frame into the corner of the window, where the actual cleaning process starts. The frame of the cleaning head can be moved elastically in relation to the fixed structure so that the control device is able to determine whether the cleaning head is in contact with a window edge. In the case of windows without frames, a sensor can be provided, the signal of the sensor being detected by the control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846111A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715563 A1 19981022; DE 19715563 C2 19991028; AT 206599 T 20011015; AU 8009498 A 19981111; CA 2286089 A1 19981022; EP 0975254 A2 20000202; EP 0975254 B1 20011010; US 6328813 B1 20011211; WO 9846111 A2 19981022; WO 9846111 A3 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801692

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801692

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025491

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801692 20011115

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-10-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206599 T 20011015

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL