Global Patent Index - EP 0975301 A1

EP 0975301 A1 2000-02-02 - STERILE CONNECTOR

Title (en)

STERILE CONNECTOR

Title (de)

STERILER KONNEKTOR

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR STERILE

Publication

EP 0975301 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922774 A

Priority

  • DE 19717765 A
  • EP 9802438 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848765A1] The invention relates to a sterile connector for linking a pipe comprised of collapsible hoses with a tank containing a medicinal liquid. Said sterile connector presents a coupler (2) provided with a channel-type cavity which is closed by a pierce-through membrane designed as a coupler covering foil. The foil is welded on the coupler inner side. The welding joint can be made using a bag-like foil. A protective cap (5) intended as a stop element obturates the channel-type cavity of the coupler. The inventive connector prevents the tank contents from glueing, is easy to handle and can be produced in a large quantity at a low cost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01); B65D 33/38 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61J 1/1406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848765A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848765 A1 19981105; AR 011468 A1 20000816; BR 9809308 A 20000704; CN 1232240 C 20051221; CN 1253489 A 20000517; DE 19717765 C1 19990225; EP 0975301 A1 20000202; EP 0975301 B1 20020731; ES 2181221 T3 20030216; JP 2001522280 A 20011113; US 6485479 B1 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160406

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160415

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160406

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805003

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2181221

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-06 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FRESENIUS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-11-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRESENIUS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805003

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010914

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE