Global Patent Index - EP 0975343 A1

EP 0975343 A1 2000-02-02 - TREATMENT OF DIABETES WITH THIAZOLIDINEDIONE AND ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE INHIBITOR

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF DIABETES WITH THIAZOLIDINEDIONE AND ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASE INHIBITOR

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG DER DIABETES MIT THIAZOLIDINDIONE UND ALPHA-GLUKOSIDASEINHIBITOR

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE A L'AIDE DE THIAZOLIDINEDIONE ET D'UN INHIBITEUR DES ALPHA-GLUCOSIDASES

Publication

EP 0975343 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939513 A

Priority

  • EP 9803691 W
  • GB 9712865 A
  • GB 9806708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857635A1] A method for the treatment of diabetes mellitus and conditions associated with diabetes mellitus in a mammal, which method comprises administering an effective non-toxic and pharmaceutically acceptable amount of an insulin sensitiser and an alpha-glucosidase inhibitor antihyperglycaemic agent, to a mammal in need thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/70; A61K 31/715

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/7008 (2006.01); A61K 31/702 (2006.01); A61K 31/7036 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/702 (2013.01); A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61K 31/445 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/715 + A61K 31/44
  2. A61K 31/702 + A61K 31/44
  3. A61K 31/445 + A61K 31/44
  4. A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/44
  5. A61K 31/44 + A61K 2300/00
  6. A61K 31/445 + A61K 2300/00
  7. A61K 31/702 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857635A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857635 A1 19981223; AP 9901720 A0 19991231; AR 013352 A1 20001227; AR 014881 A1 20010411; AU 8799998 A 19990104; BG 103966 A 20000731; BR 9810186 A 20000808; CA 2294134 A1 19981223; CN 1274282 A 20001122; CO 4940453 A1 20000724; DZ 2519 A1 20030201; EA 200000040 A1 20000828; EP 0975343 A1 20000202; IL 133138 D0 20010319; JP 2001523271 A 20011120; KR 20010013845 A 20010226; MA 26510 A1 20041220; NO 996270 A 19991217; NO 996270 D0 19991217; NZ 501345 A 20011026; OA 11631 A 20041122; PE 89199 A1 19991023; PL 337577 A1 20000828; SK 179499 A3 20001107; TR 9903072 T2 20000721; UY 25051 A1 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025263

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040528

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991124;SI PAYMENT 19991124