Global Patent Index - EP 0975344 A1

EP 0975344 A1 2000-02-02 - USE OF DESCARBOETHOXYLORATADINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE

Title (en)

USE OF DESCARBOETHOXYLORATADINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON DESCARBOETHOXYLORATIDIN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DESCARBOETHOXYLORATADINE DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE

Publication

EP 0975344 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906665 A

Priority

  • US 9803532 W
  • US 80811697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837889A1] Methods for treating urinary incontinence, vertigo and motion sickness comprising administering a therapeutically effective amount of descarboethoxyloratadine, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/445; A61P 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61P 1/08 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9837889A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837889 A1 19980903; AU 6182898 A 19980918; AU 740504 B2 20011108; BR 9807796 A 20000215; CA 2282396 A1 19980903; CN 1252722 A 20000510; EP 0975344 A1 20000202; JP 2001515475 A 20010918; KR 20000075572 A 20001215; NO 994165 A 19991025; NO 994165 D0 19990827; NZ 337400 A 20010928; NZ 513650 A 20010928; US 2002183241 A1 20021205; US 5939426 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029038

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 A

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 13/10 B

2004-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF DESCARBOETHOXYLORATADINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHERING CORPORATION

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEPRACOR INC.

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCULLOUGH, JOHN, R.

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE