Global Patent Index - EP 0975371 A1

EP 0975371 A1 2000-02-02 - ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE MODULATION OF ACTIVATING PROTEIN 1

Title (en)

ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE MODULATION OF ACTIVATING PROTEIN 1

Title (de)

ANTISENSE OLIGONUKLEOTIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DES AKTIVIERENDEN PROTEINS 1.

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ANTISENS ET PROCEDES DE MODULATION DE LA PROTEINE 1 D'ACTIVATION

Publication

EP 0975371 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98915526 A

Priority

  • US 9807386 W
  • US 83720197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846272A1] Compositions and methods for the treatment and diagnosis of diseases or disorders amenable to treatment through modulation of Activating Protein 1 (AP-1) expression are provided. In accordance with various embodiments of the present invention, oligonucleotides are provided which are specifically hybridizable with c-fos or c-jun, the genes encoding c-Fos or c-Jun, respectively. In a preferred embodiment, a method of modulating the metastasis of malignant tumors via modulation of one or more of the AP-1 subunits is provided; this method can be effected using the oligonucleotides of the invention or any other agent which modulates AP-1 or AP-1-mediated transcription.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C07H 21/04; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/08; C12P 19/34; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1135 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3181 (2013.01); C12N 2310/321 (2013.01); C12N 2310/322 (2013.01); C12N 2310/33 (2013.01); C12N 2310/334 (2013.01); C12N 2310/335 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3525
  2. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3521
  3. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3527

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846272 A1 19981022; AU 6968898 A 19981111; EP 0975371 A1 20000202; EP 0975371 A4 20021023; US 2002039741 A1 20020404; US 2003194738 A1 20031016; US 5985558 A 19991116; US 6312900 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051014

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040304

2002-10-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 12N 15/11 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE