Global Patent Index - EP 0975386 A1

EP 0975386 A1 2000-02-02 - TISSUE HEATING AND ABLATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING POROUS ELECTRODE STRUCTURES

Title (en)

TISSUE HEATING AND ABLATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING POROUS ELECTRODE STRUCTURES

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN GEWEBEWÄRMUNG UND -ABLATION MIT PORÖSEN ELEKTRODEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CHAUFFAGE ET D'ABLATION DES TISSUS UTILISANT DES STRUCTURES D'ELECTRODES POREUSES

Publication

EP 0975386 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97944275 A

Priority

  • US 9701177 W
  • US 1022396 P
  • US 1022596 P
  • US 1035496 P
  • US 63157796 A
  • US 63433496 A
  • US 63135696 A
  • US 63157596 A
  • US 63433896 A
  • US 63107496 A
  • US 63157396 A
  • US 63125296 A
  • US 63433996 A
  • US 64460596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745156A2] Porous electrode assemblies for tissue heating and ablation systems and methods enable ionic transport of electrical energy to occur substantially free of liquid perfusion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/05; A61B 17/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/1492 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00065 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00083 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00095 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00113 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00148 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00214 (2013.01); A61B 2018/0022 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00267 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00761 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00839 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00886 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1253 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1467 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1472 (2013.01); A61B 2218/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745156 A2 19971204; WO 9745156 A3 20041021; EP 0975386 A1 20000202; EP 0975386 A4 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090801

2004-12-08 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031015

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980818

2000-02-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE