Global patent index - EP 0975394 A1

EP 0975394 A1 2000-02-02 - PROCESS FOR THERMAL DESTRUCTION OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THERMAL DESTRUCTION OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR THERMISCHEN ZERSETZUNG VON SCHADSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DESTRUCTION THERMIQUE DE MATIERES DANGEREUSES

Publication

EP 0975394 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97920651 A

Priority

EP 9701797 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844992A1] To dispose of hazardous materials, for instance chlorinated compounds such as PCBs, or of materials polluted with such compounds, it is proposed to utilize the technological capabilities of already known high-temperature processes; in particular, it is proposed to utilize the technologies with high thermal production and capacity, such as the well known treatment of iron-based baths in an electric furnace, to keep the polluting materials and their cracking and oxidation derivatives at high temperature for a time sufficient to ensure their complete destruction. The end products of the treatment according to the invention, still containing aggressive molecules such as HCl, are further treated in conventional ways, for instance with calcium hydroxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 3/00; C10B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/19 (2007.01); A62D 3/32 (2007.01); A62D 101/22 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/19 (2013.01); A62D 3/32 (2013.01); A62D 2101/22 (2013.01); A62D 2203/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844992A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844992 A1 19981015; AT 219697 T 20020715; AU 2695697 A 19981030; DE 69713626 D1 20020801; DE 69713626 T2 20030206; EP 0975394 A1 20000202; EP 0975394 B1 20020626; ES 2179328 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status

2008-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050411

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050410

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050410

2004-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-20 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-02-28 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2003-02-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2179328

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-09-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69713626

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-01

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219697

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB LI SE