Global Patent Index - EP 0975428 A1

EP 0975428 A1 2000-02-02 - METHOD FOR LABELLING SAMPLE CONTAINERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR LABELLING SAMPLE CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KENNZEICHNUNG VON PROBENBEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UN MARQUAGE D'IDENTIFICATION SUR DES CONTENANTS A ECHANTILLON

Publication

EP 0975428 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908888 A

Priority

  • DE 19806049 A
  • EP 9900943 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806049A1] The invention relates to a method for providing sample containers (10) used in an analysis device in which the sample containers (10) can be heated to an operating temperature with an automatically readable identification label (12). The aim of the invention is to improve the identification labels (12) of sample containers (10) in such a way that during analysis the sample contained in the sample container (10) is not contaminated by constituents of the identification label. To this end the invention provides for the identification label (12) to be applied during production (10a) of the sample container (10), notably during the final cooling phase of the finished sample container, in a temperature range between a maximum temperature occurring during production (10a) of the sample container and the operating temperature. According to the method provided for in the invention the volatile ingredients of the identification means are advantageously evaporated during the production process, so that when the sample container is used at the operating temperature of the analysis device the sample to be analysed can no longer be contaminated by outgassing constituents of the identification means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/14; G06K 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 1/02 (2006.01); B01L 3/14 (2006.01); B41M 1/34 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01); G06K 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/228 (2013.01); B01L 3/5453 (2013.01); B44C 1/225 (2013.01); B41M 5/0047 (2013.01); B41M 5/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941014A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806049 A1 19990819; AU 2833699 A 19990830; CA 2287489 A1 19990819; CA 2287489 C 20090505; EP 0975428 A1 20000202; EP 0975428 B1 20040107; JP 2002509507 A 20020326; JP 4536832 B2 20100901; US 2003136839 A1 20030724; US 2005214463 A1 20050929; US 6899267 B2 20050531; US 7743976 B2 20100629; WO 9941014 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT