Global Patent Index - EP 0975434 A1

EP 0975434 A1 2000-02-02 - GLUEING DEVICE FOR A CORRUGATED CARDBOARD PRODUCTION FACILITY

Title (en)

GLUEING DEVICE FOR A CORRUGATED CARDBOARD PRODUCTION FACILITY

Title (de)

LEIMWERK FÜR EINE WELLPAPPENANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENCOLLAGE POUR INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE CARTON ONDULE

Publication

EP 0975434 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928078 A

Priority

  • DE 9800886 W
  • DE 19716714 A
  • DE 19748892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847628A1] The invention relates to a method for applying adhesive onto a material web, in particular onto flute crests of a corrugated side of a material web, wherein the adhesive is applied onto the surface or into the pores of a screen (30) or a continuous strip (9) with a structured surface (9a), which extends over the whole width of the material web, and wherein the surface of the lengthwise displaced material web (5) that is to be glued is brought into contact with the adhesive located on the surface or in the pores of the screen (30) or of the continuous strip (9). Instead of directly applying adhesive from a continuous strip or continuous screen onto the web which is to be glued, adhesive can first be applied onto an adhesive application element, and from this onto the web which is to be sized. The invention furthermore relates to corresponding glueing devices for implementing this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 1/14; B31F 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/14 (2006.01); B31F 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/2818 (2013.01); B05C 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847628A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847628 A1 19981029; EP 0975434 A1 20000202; EP 0975434 B1 20020925; JP 2001520579 A 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2004-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805704 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990818

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT