Global Patent Index - EP 0975459 A1

EP 0975459 A1 2000-02-02 - MOLDING THERMOSETTING POLYMERS ONTO SUBSTRATES

Title (en)

MOLDING THERMOSETTING POLYMERS ONTO SUBSTRATES

Title (de)

GIESSEN VON THERMOHÄRTENDEN POLYMEREN AUF TRÄGERMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MOULAGE DE POLYMERES THERMODURCISSANTS SUR DES SUBSTRATS

Publication

EP 0975459 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944559 A

Priority

  • US 9817795 W
  • US 91819997 A
  • US 91821597 A
  • US 91830297 A
  • US 91830397 A
  • US 92019597 A
  • US 92021497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910156A1] The apparatus and method of this invention provide a system for forming three dimensional bodies or patterns on porous materials (340) wherein a portion of the body is firmly bonded into the material. This in effect, makes the three dimensional elastomeric body substantially an integral part of the porous material (340). The process of utilizing a heated base plate or platen (330), heated mold (420) and maintaining such elements under pressure over a predetermined time period allows the polymeric material to cure and firmly bond within the porous material (340) and to form the three dimensional body. The temperature of the platen (330) is usually kept above the temperature of the mold (420). A nozzle (620) adjacent the mold (420) is maintained at a temperature substantially below the temperature of the mold (420) to prevent curing of the polymeric material in the nozzle (620). The cooling (535) and vacuum mechanisms allow continuous coupling of the nozzle (620) to the mold (420).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/14; B29C 45/16; B29C 45/22; B29C 45/73; B29C 45/74; B29C 45/77; B29C 45/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/08 (2006.01); B29C 31/06 (2006.01); B29C 33/20 (2006.01); B29C 45/14 (2006.01); B29C 45/16 (2006.01); B29C 45/18 (2006.01); B29C 45/26 (2006.01); B29C 45/27 (2006.01); B29C 45/28 (2006.01); B29C 45/53 (2006.01); B44C 1/18 (2006.01); B44C 3/04 (2006.01); B29C 35/02 (2006.01); B29C 45/76 (2006.01); B29C 45/77 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/1671 (2013.01); A41D 27/08 (2013.01); B29C 31/061 (2013.01); B29C 33/20 (2013.01); B29C 45/14 (2013.01); B29C 45/18 (2013.01); B29C 45/2606 (2013.01); B29C 45/2756 (2013.01); B29C 45/2803 (2013.01); B29C 45/53 (2013.01); B44C 1/18 (2013.01); B44C 3/046 (2013.01); B29C 35/0266 (2013.01); B29C 45/14008 (2013.01); B29C 45/14836 (2013.01); B29C 45/1816 (2013.01); B29C 45/2725 (2013.01); B29C 45/2737 (2013.01); B29C 45/76 (2013.01); B29C 45/7613 (2013.01); B29C 45/77 (2013.01); B29K 2083/005 (2013.01); B29K 2101/10 (2013.01); B29K 2713/00 (2013.01); B29L 2031/722 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910156 A1 19990304; EP 0975459 A1 20000202; EP 0975459 A4 20060524

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080909

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-05-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060407

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBERTECH PRODUCTS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: UBERTECH PRODUCTS INC.

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBERTECH TEXAS, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: UBERTECH TEXAS, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBERTECH PRODUCTS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: UBERTECH PRODUCTS INC.

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990901

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE