Global Patent Index - EP 0975467 A1

EP 0975467 A1 2000-02-02 - TRANSITORY IMAGE STRUCTURE

Title (en)

TRANSITORY IMAGE STRUCTURE

Title (de)

TRANSIENTBILDSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE D'IMAGE TRANSITOIRE

Publication

EP 0975467 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917362 A

Priority

  • GB 9801090 W
  • GB 9707849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847715A1] A transitory image structure comprises linear markings (1-10) on a substrate. The linear markings define image (31, 32) and background (30) portions respectively, the markings cooperating together such that an image generated by the image portion is not visible from all viewing angles. At least some of the lines of the markings of at least one of the portions have a physical characteristic, such as thickness, which varies in a substantially random manner along their lengths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 3/14; B42D 15/00; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/148 (2013.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847715A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847715 A1 19981029; AU 7060498 A 19981113; CA 2286551 A1 19981029; DE 69804086 D1 20020411; DE 69804086 T2 20020801; EP 0975467 A1 20000202; EP 0975467 B1 20020306; ES 2174430 T3 20021101; GB 9707849 D0 19970604

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030416

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174430 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-04-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020426

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020424

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804086 20020411

2002-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020405

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE