Global Patent Index - EP 0975476 A1

EP 0975476 A1 2000-02-02 - TEXTILE CORDS FOR PNEUMATIC TIRES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH CORDS

Title (en)

TEXTILE CORDS FOR PNEUMATIC TIRES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH CORDS

Title (de)

TEXTILKORDE FÜR REIFEN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

CABLES TEXTILES POUR PNEUMATIQUES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CES CABLES

Publication

EP 0975476 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907555 A

Priority

  • US 9803363 W
  • US 83744997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847725A1] Special cords of textile material are used for reinforcing a portion of a pneumatic tire. The cord comprises at least one yarn and has a first portion adjacent to its outer peripheral surface and a second radially inner portion, adjacent to its core, wherein the second portion is constituted by filaments which are compacted and possibly fused together and the first portion by discrete filaments. Further a method for making such cord and a pneumatic tire including such cord are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 9/00; D02G 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); B60C 9/20 (2006.01); D02G 3/48 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/48 (2013.01); B60C 9/0042 (2013.01); B60C 9/20 (2013.01); Y10S 57/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847725A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847725 A1 19981029; AT 211686 T 20020115; AU 6332998 A 19981113; BR 9809080 A 20000801; CA 2284973 A1 19981029; CN 1252760 A 20000510; DE 69803447 D1 20020228; DE 69803447 T2 20020808; EP 0975476 A1 20000202; EP 0975476 B1 20020109; JP 2001523188 A 20011120; JP 4127414 B2 20080730; KR 20010006427 A 20010126; PL 336096 A1 20000605; US 6112789 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140220

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140220

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69803447

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140220

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69803447

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803447 20020228

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211686 T 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL