Global Patent Index - EP 0975484 A1

EP 0975484 A1 2000-02-02 - FUEL TANK EQUIPPED WITH A GAS EVACUATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

FUEL TANK EQUIPPED WITH A GAS EVACUATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFTANK MIT ENTLÜFTUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR A CARBURANT MUNI D'UN SYSTEME D'EVACUATION DES GAZ

Publication

EP 0975484 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904913 A

Priority

  • FR 9900380 W
  • FR 9802020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774951A1] A passage (12) connects tank interior and exterior. A membrane (7) blocking this passage, allows air and fuel vapor through, whilst preventing escape of liquid fuel. Preferred features: The passage comprises a hose tail insert (12) high on the casing. One end (19) is inside the casing and carries the membrane. The other end (15) is outside the tank, and connects to a vent pipe. Membrane and insert cross sectional area, suffices to pass sufficient gas flow rate. The membrane is included in the casing and covers a major area of its upper wall, conforming with a shallow pocket. The passage is formed by an opening in the upper wall of the casing, the membrane extending across it. A tank closure section, covers the membrane, also sealing and closing the tank opening. This closure section carries a connection for the vent pipe, connecting it to the space between membrane and closure. In addition, the closure carries a grid, supporting the membrane against the pressure of surging fuel. The tank comprises two adhered or welded, pressure injection molded sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 15/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/035 (2006.01); B60K 15/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/035 (2013.01); B60K 15/03177 (2013.01); B60K 15/03504 (2013.01); B60K 2015/03453 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942318A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774951 A1 19990820; FR 2774951 B1 20000505; CA 2287492 A1 19990826; EP 0975484 A1 20000202; US 6557719 B1 20030506; WO 9942318 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE