Global Patent Index - EP 0975503 A1

EP 0975503 A1 2000-02-02 - RAIL VEHICLE WITH COUPLING ELEMENT UNIT BETWEEN THE BODY OF THE WAGON AND THE CHASSIS

Title (en)

RAIL VEHICLE WITH COUPLING ELEMENT UNIT BETWEEN THE BODY OF THE WAGON AND THE CHASSIS

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUG MIT KOPPELELEMENTEINHEITEN ZWISCHEN WAGENKASTEN UND FAHRWERK

Title (fr)

VEHICULE SUR RAILS AVEC UNITE A ELEMENTS D'ACCOUPLEMENT ENTRE LA CAISSE ET LE CHASSIS

Publication

EP 0975503 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965174 A

Priority

  • DE 19805895 A
  • EP 9807583 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805895C1] The superstructure (1) vertically supported on a bogie frame via a pair of connector units. The units comprise of a slide connector (11), e.g. a roller table, with two slide members (11.1,11.2). One slide member is freely moveable in a plane parallel to the base of the superstructure, through limited distances and relative to the other slide member. One slide member consists of two plates (11.3,11.4), connected via a damper ring (11.5). One member is connected to a passive/active actuator (9), e.g. a hydraulic cylinder with hydro-pneumatic control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805895 C1 19990708; AT 264210 T 20040415; CA 2281728 A1 19990819; CZ 286362 B6 20000315; CZ 9902823 A3 19991215; EP 0975503 A1 20000202; EP 0975503 B1 20040414; ES 2218879 T3 20041116; HU 0001544 A2 20000928; HU 0001544 A3 20011228; HU 222126 B1 20030428; JP 2000510417 A 20000815; JP 3383805 B2 20030310; KR 100356132 B1 20021019; KR 20010006079 A 20010115; US 6279488 B1 20010828; WO 9941126 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061124

2005-11-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218879 T3

2004-10-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811202 P 20040519

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990601

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL