Global Patent Index - EP 0975511 A2

EP 0975511 A2 2000-02-02 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE ANCHOR OR ANCHOR CHAIN

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE ANCHOR OR ANCHOR CHAIN

Title (de)

ANKER-/ANKERKETTEN-ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'ANCRE OU DE CHAINE D'ANCRE

Publication

EP 0975511 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98928212 A

Priority

  • DE 19716684 A
  • EP 9802347 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716684A1] The present invention relates to a device for monitoring the anchor or anchor chain, intended for facilities floating ahead of the anchor such as ships, comprising a measurement device (6) which determines by means of one or more sensors (17) the prevailing state at one or more points of the anchor chain (3) or anchor (4), between the anchor chain (3) and the ship (1) or between the anchor (4) and the ship (1), then generates an electrical signal representative of the strength to the monitoring facility (12) which, upon reception of the signal transmitted by the measurement device, sends a corresponding signal (7), and also comprising an alarm system (9) which receives the signal (7) sent by the transmitter (12) and triggers the alarm if the measured state exceeds a set value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/22; G01L 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/00 (2013.01); B63B 2021/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847758A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716684 A1 19981022; DE 19716684 B4 20091126; AU 731816 B2 20010405; AU 8014598 A 19981113; EP 0975511 A2 20000202; EP 0975511 B1 20040107; ES 2214713 T3 20040916; US 2003128138 A1 20030710; US 6472983 B1 20021029; US 7034680 B2 20060425; WO 9847758 A2 19981029; WO 9847758 A3 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110422

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810549

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214713 T3

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810549 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEEP BLUE TECHNOLOGY AG

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 21/22 A, 7G 01L 5/04 B, 7G 08C 19/28 B

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT