Global Patent Index - EP 0975533 A1

EP 0975533 A1 2000-02-02 - COUPLING

Title (en)

COUPLING

Title (de)

KUPPLUNG

Title (fr)

RACCORD D'ACCOUPLEMENT

Publication

EP 0975533 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97938698 A

Priority

  • BE 9700096 W
  • BE 9700295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843894A1] This invention relates to an assembly of a container and a coupling for coupling said container to a device for applying a component present in the container. The coupling comprises a first and a second coupling piece that are rotatably connectable. One of the coupling pieces is provided for attachment to the container. The other coupling piece is provided for attachment to the device. The container comprises a valve for closing off said container, which valve is provided for being opened during effectuation of the coupling. One of the coupling pieces is provided with a guide and the other coupling piece is provided with a protrusion for cooperating with said guide. The protrusion is moveable within said guide, between a first position and a second position, in maximum one turn, which first position corresponds to an uncoupled state of said coupling and a closed position of the valve, and which second position corresponds to a coupled state of the coupling and an opened position of said valve. The coupling can preferably be bolted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/08 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/0894 (2013.01); B65D 83/207 (2013.01); B65D 83/756 (2013.01); B65D 83/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843894A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843894 A1 19981008; AU 4106897 A 19981022; BE 1011341 A6 19990706; CZ 295569 B6 20050817; CZ 9903410 A3 20001115; DE 69731772 D1 20041230; DE 69731772 T2 20051222; EE 04488 B1 20050615; EE 9900432 A 20000417; EP 0975533 A1 20000202; EP 0975533 B1 20041124; ES 2234027 T3 20050616; PL 188344 B1 20050131; PL 188358 B1 20050131; PL 335973 A1 20000605

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234027 T3

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69731772 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL