Global Patent Index - EP 0975539 A1

EP 0975539 A1 2000-02-02 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING SURFACES OF FLAT OBJECTS TO PRODUCE PREDETERMINED SEPARATION POINTS IN A PLURALITY OF SUCH FLAT OBJECTS ARRANGED AT LEAST PARTIALLY IN A PILE

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR TREATING SURFACES OF FLAT OBJECTS TO PRODUCE PREDETERMINED SEPARATION POINTS IN A PLURALITY OF SUCH FLAT OBJECTS ARRANGED AT LEAST PARTIALLY IN A PILE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN VON FLÄCHIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON VORBESTIMMTEN TRENNSTELLEN IN EINER ANZAHL VON MINDESTENS TEILWEISE AUFEINANDERLIEGENDEN, DERARTIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES D'OBJETS PLATS EN VUE DE PRODUIRE DES POINTS DE SEPARATION PREDETERMINES DANS UNE PLURALITE DE TELS OBJETS AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT SUPERPOSES

Publication

EP 0975539 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910566 A

Priority

  • CH 9800128 W
  • CH 88897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846507A1] The inventive composition (3) contains an anti-static agent and a lubricating agent. A flat object (2) with a surface which has been treated with this type of composition acts as a predetermined separation point in a plurality of such objects arranged at least partially in a pile. The lubricating agent reduces the friction coefficient between the treated surface and the surface of the next object and therefore reduces the static friction between the two objects. The anti-static agent reduces the static charge of the objects in contact with each other and therefore also reduces the bond which can be produced between these objects by static charging. These two effects ensure that in a plurality of flat objects which are arranged on top of one another and are statically charged by means of a field of direct current, a displacement force (11) from a component parallel to the main surfaces of the objects produces a displacement at the point of the treated surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/18; B65H 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 3/18 (2006.01); B65H 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 33/06 (2013.01); B65H 3/18 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846507 A1 19981022; WO 9846507 A9 20001005; AT 207030 T 20011115; AU 6493198 A 19981111; AU 726817 B2 20001123; CA 2286595 A1 19981022; DE 59801783 D1 20011122; DK 0975539 T3 20020211; EP 0975539 A1 20000202; EP 0975539 B1 20011017; JP 2001523203 A 20011120; RU 2196050 C2 20030110; US 6569817 B1 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-03-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801783

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120408

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070407

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2005-05-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020111

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801783 20011122

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 207030 T 20011115

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE