Global Patent Index - EP 0975542 A1

EP 0975542 A1 2000-02-02 - METHODS FOR MAKING AND PROCESSING HIGH BULK TISSUE WEBS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR MAKING AND PROCESSING HIGH BULK TISSUE WEBS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR PRODUKTION UND VERARBEITUNG VON HOCHVOLUMINÖSEN TISSUEPAPIERROLLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE BANDES DE PAPIER SOIE A GONFLANT ELEVE

Publication

EP 0975542 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98915628 A

Priority

  • US 9807838 W
  • US 84509897 A
  • US 4990898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846509A1] A method for processing high bulk tissue webs includes forming a wet web, drying the web, winding the dried web to form a plurality of parents rolls (R), unwinding the parent rolls by transmitting torque through the roll center and/or ends, moving the partially unwound roll to effect splicing with a subsequent parent roll, and rewinding the thus united web. In particular embodiments, the torque transmitting means (20) comprise side clamping mechanisms that engage only the end surfaces of the parent rolls. In other embodiments, an automated off-line method for splicing tissue webs from different parent rolls utilizes a finishing unit (23) that substantially continuously impacts each web during unwinding the splice the webs together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18; B65H 16/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 16/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/12 (2006.01); B65H 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/1868 (2013.01); B65H 16/10 (2013.01); B65H 16/103 (2013.01); B65H 16/106 (2013.01); B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 19/126 (2013.01); B65H 19/1836 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41464 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41525 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4172 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4621 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4632 (2013.01); B65H 2405/422 (2013.01); B65H 2405/451 (2013.01); B65H 2405/452 (2013.01); B65H 2406/31 (2013.01); B65H 2407/30 (2013.01); B65H 2701/177 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846509A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846509 A1 19981022; AU 6976498 A 19981111; AU 732712 B2 20010426; BR 9808544 A 20000523; CA 2285949 A1 19981022; CA 2285949 C 20061219; CN 1108974 C 20030521; CN 1259102 A 20000705; DE 69820605 D1 20040129; DE 69820605 T2 20041111; DE 69827174 D1 20041125; DE 69827174 T2 20050224; DE 69836443 D1 20061228; EP 0975542 A1 20000202; EP 0975542 B1 20031217; ES 2225705 T3 20050316; ES 2275790 T3 20070616; HK 1028760 A1 20030926; JP 2002515845 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820605 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE