Global Patent Index - EP 0975544 A1

EP 0975544 A1 2000-02-02 - DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING OF A MULTILAYER CORD

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ELECTROSTATIC CHARGING OF A MULTILAYER CORD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ELEKTROSTATISCHEN AUFLADEN EINES MEHRLAGIGEN STRANGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CHARGER ELECTROSTATIQUEMENT UNE BANDE MULTICOUCHE

Publication

EP 0975544 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931926 A

Priority

  • DE 9801063 W
  • DE 19716325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6822844B2] A multiple layer web is provided with an electrostatic charge for the purpose of adhering the multiple webs to each other. A pair of oppositely charged rollers contact the surface of the multiple layer printing aper web and impart the charge to the web. The pair of oppositely charged rollers are positioned directly before a cylinder folding group of a web-fed rotary printing press.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 39/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/02 (2013.01); B65H 39/16 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847802A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 2003090851 A1 20030515; US 6822844 B2 20041123; DE 19716325 A1 19981022; DE 19716325 C2 20010426; EP 0975544 A1 20000202; EP 0975544 B1 20011212; JP 2000510426 A 20000815; JP 3553977 B2 20040811; US 6577489 B1 20030610; WO 9847802 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120417

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802441

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110502

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802441 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE