Global Patent Index - EP 0975562 A1

EP 0975562 A1 2000-02-02 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A CODED CHEMICAL LIBRARY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A CODED CHEMICAL LIBRARY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KODIERTEN CHEMISCHEN BIBLIOTHEK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE BANQUE CHIMIQUE CODEE

Publication

EP 0975562 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917351 A

Priority

  • GB 9801077 W
  • GB 9707742 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846550A1] A method for the preparation of a coded chemical library, which method comprises synthesising the chemical library on a plurality of synthesis particles and writing code on the synthesis particles using high-energy radiation during library synthesis, so as to provide the chemical library on a plurality of coded synthesis particles, and wherein the identity of library compounds associated with a synthesis particle is established by reference to its code.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07B 61/00; B01J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/12 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C40B 70/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00468 (2013.01); B01J 2219/005 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00502 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0054 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00547 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0059 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00592 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0072 (2013.01); C40B 70/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846550 A1 19981022; AU 7059698 A 19981111; EP 0975562 A1 20000202; GB 9707742 D0 19970604; JP 2002501489 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-12-10 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Free text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS PURSUANT TO RULE 112(1) EPC, EPO FORM 2021A DATED 13-08-2008

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070913

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE