Global Patent Index - EP 0975606 A1

EP 0975606 A1 2000-02-02 - CRAMBESCIDIN COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

CRAMBESCIDIN COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

CRAMBESCIDIN-VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE CRAMBESCIDINE

Publication

EP 0975606 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918287 A

Priority

  • US 9807644 W
  • US 4332797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846575A1] Together with the know crambescidins (1-5) and ptilomycalin A (6), two new minor crambescidins 834 (7), 818 (8) with a chlorinated spermidine unit and four new minor crambescidins 673 (9), 687 (10), 657 (11) and 13, 14, 15-isocrambescidin 657 (12) without a spermidine derivative unit have been obtained by FABMS guided isolation from extracts of the Mediterranean sponge Crambe crambe. Their structures were elucidated by interpretation of spectral data (see Figures 4-9). In a parallel bioassay against L1210 murine leukemia cells, crambescidins 834 (7), 818 (8) and 657 (11) were shown to be five times as cytotoxic as the knows crambescidin 816 (1). Crambescidins with a spermidine or spermidine derivative unit also exhibited antimicrobial activity against Rhodotorula glutinis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/00; A01N 43/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/90 (2006.01); A61K 31/527 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 491/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/22 (2013.01); A01N 43/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846575 A1 19981022; AU 7124198 A 19981111; AU 752529 B2 20020919; BR 9808905 A 20000801; CA 2286738 A1 19981022; CN 1259938 A 20000712; EP 0975606 A1 20000202; EP 0975606 A4 20020612; HU 0003765 A2 20010528; HU 0003765 A3 20020729; IL 132402 D0 20010319; JP 2002516609 A 20020604; KR 20010006403 A 20010126; NO 313637 B1 20021104; NO 995015 A 19991116; NO 995015 D0 19991014; PL 336307 A1 20000619; US 6028077 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMA MAR, S.A.

2002-06-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 239/00 A, 7A 01N 43/54 B, 7C 07D 491/22 B

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE