Global patent index - EP 0975610 A4

EP 0975610 A4 2000-05-17 - TRIPEPTIDE AND TETRAPEPTIDE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

TRIPEPTIDE AND TETRAPEPTIDE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

TRIPEPTIDE UND TETRAPEPTIDE ALS PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE DE TRIPEPTIDES ET DE TETRAPEPTIDES

Publication

EP 0975610 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98907625 A

Priority

  • US 9803666 W
  • US 3911597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838178A1] The invention provides novel cryptophycin compounds which can be useful for disrupting the microtubulin system, as antineoplastic agents, and for the treatment of cancer. The invention further provides a formulation for administering the novel cryptophycin compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 273/00; A61K 31/395; C07D 413/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/395 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 257/02 (2006.01); C07D 273/00 (2006.01); C07D 413/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 273/00 (2013.01); C07D 413/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838178 A1 19980903; AU 6338698 A 19980918; CA 2281107 A1 19980903; EP 0975610 A1 20000202; EP 0975610 A4 20000517; JP 2001513775 A 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011115

2000-05-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 273/00 A, 7C 07D 413/06 B, 7A 61K 31/395 B

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990819

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990810;LT PAYMENT 19990819;LV PAYMENT 19990819;RO PAYMENT 19990819;SI PAYMENT 19990819