Global Patent Index - EP 0975695 A2

EP 0975695 A2 2000-02-02 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SLIP AND ANTIBLOCK AGENTS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SLIP AND ANTIBLOCK AGENTS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, ENTHALTEND GLEIT- UND ANTIBLOCKMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS RENFERMANT DES AGENTS GLISSANTS ET ANTIADHERENTS

Publication

EP 0975695 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98915601 A

Priority

  • US 9807650 W
  • US 4395497 P
  • US 6970597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846672A2] Disclosed are resin compositions comprising: a homogeneous ethylene/ alpha -olefin interpolymer; and a saturated fatty acid amide or saturated ethylenebis(amide); and an unsaturated fatty acid amide or unsaturated ethylenebis(amide); and a finely divided inorganic compound. Also disclosed are compositions comprising a saturated fatty acid amide or saturated ethylenebis(amide), an unsaturated fatty acid amide or unsaturated ethylenebis(amide), and a finely divided inorganic compound and a substantially random interpolymer of one or more alpha -olefins with one or more vinylidene aromatic monomers and/or one or more hindered aliphatic or cycloaliphatic vinylidene monomers or blend compositions therefrom. Also disclosed are compositions which comprise at least one homogeneous ethylene/ alpha -olefin interpolymer or substantially random interpolymer of one or more alpha -olefins with one or more vinylidene aromatic monomers and/or or more hindered aliphatic or cycloaliphatic vinylidene monomers, at least one slip agent, and at least one modifying agent comprising propylene homopolymers, propylene copolymers, nucleating agents, and mixtures thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 23/04; C08K 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 210/02 (2006.01); C08J 5/18 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/20 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01); C08L 23/12 (2006.01); C08L 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2013.01); C08K 3/0008 (2013.01); C08K 5/20 (2013.01); C08L 23/08 (2013.01); C08L 23/0815 (2013.01); C08J 2323/08 (2013.01); C08L 23/0838 (2013.01); C08L 23/10 (2013.01); C08L 2314/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 3/0008 + C08L 23/04
  2. C08K 5/20 + C08L 23/04
  3. C08L 23/08 + C08L 2666/04
  4. C08L 23/0815 + C08L 2666/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846672A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846672 A2 19981022; WO 9846672 A3 19990114; AR 012432 A1 20001018; AU 6974098 A 19981111; BR 9809570 A 20001017; CA 2284604 A1 19981022; CN 1252824 A 20000510; DE 975695 T1 20000629; EP 0975695 A2 20000202; ES 2141696 T1 20000401; JP 2001520697 A 20011030; TW 387920 B 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1022488

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2000-09-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-06-29 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-04-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2000-04-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141696

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2000-03-24 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-03-01 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: ING. A, GIAMBROCONO & C. SRL

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991116

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE