Global Patent Index - EP 0975721 A1

EP 0975721 A1 2000-02-02 - GELLED CLEANING AGENT FOR FLUSH TOILETS

Title (en)

GELLED CLEANING AGENT FOR FLUSH TOILETS

Title (de)

GELFÖRMIGES REINIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR SPÜLTOILETTEN

Title (fr)

PRODUIT GELIFIE DE NETTOYAGE DE TOILETTES A CHASSE D'EAU

Publication

EP 0975721 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921455 A

Priority

  • DE 19715872 A
  • EP 9802123 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715872A1] The object of the invention is to improve the stability, fragrance, cleaning power and rechargeability of gelled cleaning agents, preferably for flush toilets. This object is attained by preparing a gelled, shear-reducing cleaning agent which contains 1 to 5 % by weight of a polysaccharide, 3 to 25 % by weight of a C8-C22 alkylpolyglycoside as a component of the surfactant system, up to 15 % by weight fragrance and if required other ingredients such as scale preventives, dyes, disinfectants, nacreous brighteners, stabilisers, cleaning power reinforcing agents and odour absorbers. The cleaning agent has a viscosity from 30,000 to 150,000 mPas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/66; C11D 11/00; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 17/003 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846712A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715872 A1 19981022; DE 19715872 C2 19990429; AT 269389 T 20040715; BR 9811461 A 20000912; CA 2287449 A1 19981022; DE 59811584 D1 20040722; DK 0975721 T3 20041025; EP 0975721 A1 20000202; EP 0975721 B1 20040616; ES 2224390 T3 20050301; JP 2001518969 A 20011016; WO 9846712 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150412

2016-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150411

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150412

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150411

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150411

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-01-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150411

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 269389 T

- Effective date: 20150411

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140414

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224390 T3

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811584 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991007

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE