Global Patent Index - EP 0975808 A2

EP 0975808 A2 2000-02-02 - TOPOLOGICALLY FIXED MATRIX BONDED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE

Title (en)

TOPOLOGICALLY FIXED MATRIX BONDED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE

Title (de)

TOPOLOGISCH FIXIERTES, MATRIXGEBUNDENES NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜL

Title (fr)

MOLECULE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE LIEE A LA MATRICE ET TOPOLOGIQUEMENT FIXEE

Publication

EP 0975808 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98963380 A

Priority

  • DE 9803466 W
  • DE 19753182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927131A2] The invention relates to nucleic acid molecules which are bonded on a surface in such a way that coiling energy or superhelicity cannot escape from said molecules. The invention also relates to a method with which such enzyme actions can be examined, said enzyme actions changing the topological state of DNA. Such nucleic acid molecules and methods can be utilized in pharmaceutical research in the automated search for cytostatics or antibiotics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6834 (2013.01); C12N 15/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927131A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927131 A2 19990603; WO 9927131 A3 19991007; DE 19753182 A1 19990729; EP 0975808 A2 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE IT LI