Global patent index - EP 0975823 A1

EP 0975823 A1 2000-02-02 - ELECTROLYTIC HIGH-SPEED DEPOSITION OF ALUMINIUM ON CONTINUOUS PRODUCTS

Title (en)

ELECTROLYTIC HIGH-SPEED DEPOSITION OF ALUMINIUM ON CONTINUOUS PRODUCTS

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYT FÜR DIE ELEKTROLYTISCHE HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSABSCHEIDUNG VON ALUMINIUM AUF ENDLOSPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

ELECTROLYTE POUR DEPOSITION ELECTROLYTIQUE D'ALUMINIUM A VITESSE ELEVEE SUR DES PRODUITS CONTINUS

Publication

EP 0975823 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924119 A

Priority

  • DE 19716495 A
  • EP 9802197 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716495C1] The invention relates to an electrolyte for electrolytic high-speed aluminium deposition on continuous products, comprising a metal organic aluminium complex of formula (I): MF . 2 Al(C3H7)3 . n AlR3, wherein M = K, Rb, Cs, R = a C3-alkyl group or a mixture or C3 and C1-C2 alkyl group and n = 0.1 to 1 in an aromatic or aliphatic hydrocarbon which is used as a solvent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848082A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716495 C1 19980520; AT 209264 T 20011215; AU 7643598 A 19981113; CA 2287511 A1 19981029; EP 0975823 A1 20000202; EP 0975823 B1 20011121; JP 2001521582 A 20011106; JP 3605772 B2 20041222; US 6207036 B1 20010327; WO 9848082 A1 19981029; ZA 9803273 B 19981027

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130415

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130415

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, GODEMEYER, KIERDORF & PARTNER, PATE, DE

2011-08-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59802731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2010-07-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-05-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100429 AND 20100505

2010-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALUMINAL OBERFLÄCHENTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALUMINAL OBERFLÄCHENTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-02 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-02-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALUMINAL OBERFLAECHTENTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-26 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 711B

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-05-08 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 711B

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-02-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-11-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 209264

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991116

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE