Global Patent Index - EP 0975825 A2

EP 0975825 A2 2000-02-02 - DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT CONTINUOUS ELECTROLYTIC PRECIPITATION PROCESSES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT CONTINUOUS ELECTROLYTIC PRECIPITATION PROCESSES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN KONTINUIERLICHER ELEKTROLYTISCHER ABSCHEIDUNGSPROZESSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE DES PROCESSUS DE PRECIPITATION ELECTROLYTIQUE EN CONTINU

Publication

EP 0975825 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98922686 A

Priority

  • DE 19716369 A
  • EP 9802117 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716369A1] A device (1) for carrying out continuous electrolytic precipitation processes has a cathodic live cylinder (3) whose top surface is electroconductive over its whole useful width. An anode A is arranged concentrically to and spaced apart from the cathodic live cylinder (3). An electrolyte flows through the space (6) separating the live cylinder (3) from the anode A. Shielding strips (9, 9') associated to the live cylinder (3) are located between the cathodic surface of the live cylinder (3) and the anode A and electrically shield the marginal regions of the live cylinder (3), thus protecting them from electrolytic coating. The useful region N of the live cylinder (3) for carrying out the electrolytic precipitation processes is located between the shielding strips (9, 9'). The side of the shielding strips (9, 9') facing the useful region N has a shoulder (25') which reduces to zero the thickness of a metal strip to be produced or coated on one side, in the marginal region of the metal strip up to the shielding strip edge, so that no coating is deposited on the live cylinder outside the useful region N. The device (1) is useful both for electrolytically producing metal strips and for electrolytically coating one side of metal strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/04 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/04 (2013.01); C25D 7/0635 (2013.01); C25D 7/0671 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848083A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716369 A1 19981022; AT 201724 T 20010615; AU 7523898 A 19981113; BR 9808683 A 20000711; CA 2286813 A1 19981029; CA 2286813 C 20031007; CN 1113984 C 20030709; CN 1251624 A 20000426; DE 59800799 D1 20010705; EP 0975825 A2 20000202; EP 0975825 B1 20010530; ES 2157661 T3 20010816; JP 2000510532 A 20000815; JP 3237762 B2 20011210; KR 100340349 B1 20020612; KR 20010006412 A 20010126; MD 2173 F2 20030531; MD 990273 A 20020630; PL 336496 A1 20000703; RU 2180021 C2 20020227; US 6306268 B1 20011023; WO 9848083 A2 19981029; WO 9848083 A3 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040412

2005-04-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040412

2004-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157661

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800799

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-05

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 201724

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIRCUIT FOIL LUXEMBOURG TRADING S.A.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIRCUIT FOIL S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 25D 1/04 A, 7C 25D 7/00 B, 7C 25D 7/06 B

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIRCUIT FOIL S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ-PATENTVERWALTUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIRCUIT FOIL S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ-PATENTVERWALTUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990906

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE