Global Patent Index - EP 0975839 A1

EP 0975839 A1 2000-02-02 - COMPACTOR FOR COMPACTING SOIL

Title (en)

COMPACTOR FOR COMPACTING SOIL

Title (de)

STAMPFGERÄT ZUR BODENVERDICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COMPACTEUR DESTINE AU COMPACTAGE DU SOL

Publication

EP 0975839 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98909445 A

Priority

  • DE 29707017 U
  • EP 9800768 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6293729B1] A compactor for compacting soil which can be controlled by hand using a bow-shaped control element or similar element. The compactor has a compacting or ramming working mass which is driven by a combustion engine back and forth, linearly, by a crank mechanism and a spring assembly. The compactor is also supported on the ground by a single-axle dolly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/046; E01C 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/046 (2006.01); B06B 1/16 (2006.01); E01C 19/36 (2006.01); E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E02D 3/061 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/36 (2013.01); B06B 1/166 (2013.01); E02D 3/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848119A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707017 U1 19970710; DE 59813124 D1 20060302; EP 0975839 A1 20000202; EP 0975839 B1 20051019; JP 2001521593 A 20011106; JP 3776131 B2 20060517; US 6293729 B1 20010925; WO 9848119 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130211

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813124

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120426 AND 20120502

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59813124

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59813124

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59813124

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2006-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061208

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813124 P 20060302

2006-02-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990317

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE