Global Patent Index - EP 0975840 B1

EP 0975840 B1 2001-03-07 - DEVICE FOR ATTACHING INTERCHANGEABLE ITEMS OF EQUIPMENT RAPIDLY, FOR AN EXCAVATOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ATTACHING INTERCHANGEABLE ITEMS OF EQUIPMENT RAPIDLY, FOR AN EXCAVATOR

Title (de)

SCHNELLWECHSELVORRICHTUNG FÜR BAGGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE RAPIDE POUR PELLE MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 0975840 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98914694 A

Priority

  • AT 9800093 W
  • AT 22597 U
  • AT 22697 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846835A1] The invention relates to a device for rapidly attaching interchangeable items of equipment to the boom of an excavator. The device has a latch mechanism (4) which in the locked position engages in a suitably shaped recess in the item of equipment being attached. A hydraulic cylinder (16) for operating the latch mechanism (4) is provided in the changing device (1), the piston rod of said cylinder being coupled to said latch mechanism (4). A safety bolt (15) is provided to prevent the latch mechanism from being moved back unintentionally. Said safety bolt rests against the rear side (14) of the latch mechanism (4) when in its operating position and prevents said latch mechanism from being pushed back into the rapid attachment device (1). A hydraulic cylinder (16) is provided for operating the safety bolt (15), the piston rod of said hydraulic cylinder (16) preferably forms the safety bolt (15) directly. The piston in the hydraulic cylinder (16) is spring-loaded, so that the safety bolt (15) is pushed into its operating position when there is no pressure in the cylinder (16). This ensures that the safety bolt (15) is always pushed into its operating position when there is a pressure drop in the hydraulic system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3627 (2013.01); E02F 3/364 (2013.01); E02F 3/365 (2013.01); E02F 3/3663 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846835 A1 19981022; AU 6910498 A 19981111; DE 59800510 D1 20010412; EP 0975840 A1 20000202; EP 0975840 B1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800510

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800510

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130409

2014-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130416

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800510 20010412

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991013

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991013

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991013