Global Patent Index - EP 0975843 A1

EP 0975843 A1 2000-02-02 - WALL PANEL WITH DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING SUPERPOSED WOODEN PLANKS OF THE PANEL

Title (en)

WALL PANEL WITH DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING SUPERPOSED WOODEN PLANKS OF THE PANEL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON HOLZBRETTERN FÜR EINEN WANDAUFBAU

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PLANCHES DE BOIS CONSTITUTIVES DE PAROIS DE CONSTRUCTION

Publication

EP 0975843 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921535 A

Priority

  • FR 9800745 W
  • FR 9704760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762251A1] The invention concerns a device for assembling at least a series of wooden planks (3) each having two opposite ends (4) and two opposite longitudinal edges (6, 7) and which are superposed edge to edge to form a wall (1, 2). The device comprises a vertical strut (60) provided with means linking one of the two ends (4) of each plank (3) with said strut (60), the linking means comprising, for each series of superposed planks (3), a series of tenons (11) extending perpendicular to the vertical strut (10), in a common vertical plane, to co-operate with mortises (12) arranged in the corresponding end (4) of the planks (3). The vertical strut (10) consists of a plurality of mutually butt-jointed sections (21) each provided with at least one tenon (11) of each series of tenons.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848127A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762251 A1 19981023; FR 2762251 B1 19990604; AT 209281 T 20011215; AU 7435798 A 19981113; BR 9808556 A 20000523; CA 2286571 A1 19981029; DE 69803280 D1 20020221; EP 0975843 A1 20000202; EP 0975843 B1 20011121; US 5996302 A 19991207; WO 9848127 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-05-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011121

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020414

2002-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020414

2002-02-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-02-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803280 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209281 T 20011215

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WALL PANEL WITH DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING SUPERPOSED WOODEN PLANKS OF THE PANEL

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE