Global Patent Index - EP 0975847 A1

EP 0975847 A1 2000-02-02 - SECURITY CONSTRUCTION FOR THE TOP OF AN ENCLOSING WALL

Title (en)

SECURITY CONSTRUCTION FOR THE TOP OF AN ENCLOSING WALL

Title (de)

SICHERUNGSKONSTRUKTION FÜR DEN OBERRAND EINER UMFRIEDUNG

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE SECURITE POUR LA PARTIE SUPERIEURE D'UN MUR D'ENCEINTE

Publication

EP 0975847 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913687 A

Priority

  • DE 19709634 A
  • EP 9801345 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19709634C1] The invention relates to a security construction (1) for the top of an enclosing wall (M), comprising supports (2) which have a fixing section (2a) and a bracket (2b) angled opposite said fixing section, and a fence covering consisting of a fence element (4) which is fixed to the fixing section (2a) of the supports (2) and an expanded metal element (3). Said expanded metal element (3) has a first section (3a) which is supported on the top surface (2e) of the bracket (2b), a second section (3b) which is angled opposite said first section (3a) towards the underside (2g) of said bracket (2b) and a third section (3e) which is angled from said second section (3b). Said third section (3e) projects freely over the free end (2f) of said bracket (2b). A security construction of this type is easy to assemble with a high degree of efficiency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/00; E04H 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/003 (2013.01); E04H 17/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840587A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19709634 C1 19980430; AT 224989 T 20021015; AU 6829198 A 19980929; EP 0975847 A1 20000202; EP 0975847 B1 20020925; WO 9840587 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LACKUS WERNER

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0975847E

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH GB IE LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224989 T 20021015

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990908

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH GB IE LI