Global Patent Index - EP 0975849 A1

EP 0975849 A1 2000-02-02 - PROTECTIVE SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING STRUCTURAL WOODWORK

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING STRUCTURAL WOODWORK

Title (de)

SCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR TÜR- UND FENSTERSTRUKTURELEMENTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PROTECTION D'ELEMENTS STRUCTURELS DE MENUISERIE DE BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0975849 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98917281 A

Priority

  • FR 9800655 W
  • FR 9704729 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762038A1] The invention concerns sheathing elements consisting of plastic sections (4, 5, 6) externally covering the structural elements (101, 102, 201, 202). The sections comprise a front wall (401, 501, 601) and at least two ribs (402, 403, 404; 502, 503) provided at their edges opposite the front wall with splines (406) extending towards each other. The sections are maintained on the structural elements by fixing studs (7) distributed along the sections, spaced from one another. The studs comprise a polygonal base (71), a narrow central part (72) and a head with pins (73), the head being inserted between two ribs supporting the section by being engaged with the splines (406), and the base being set between these splines and the structural element to ensure a continuous spacing between the plastic section and the structural element. The invention is applicable to building woodwork, such as windows or the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 3/968

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846849A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES IT LI LU MC

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762038 A1 19981016; FR 2762038 B1 19990625; AU 7053898 A 19981111; DE 69803562 D1 20020314; DE 69803562 T2 20020822; EP 0975849 A1 20000202; EP 0975849 B1 20020123; ES 2172129 T3 20020916; WO 9846849 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MENUISERIE *BIER S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050402

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MENUISERIE *BIER S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-06-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-04-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-04-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-23 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172129 T3

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803562 20020314

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES IT LI LU MC

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES IT LI LU MC