Global Patent Index - EP 0975853 A1

EP 0975853 A1 2000-02-02 - DOWNHOLE COILED TUBING RECOVERY APPARATUS

Title (en)

DOWNHOLE COILED TUBING RECOVERY APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS ZURÜCKHOLEN VON EINEM IM BOHRLOCH GEWICKELTEN ROHRSTRANG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE RECUPERATION, D'UN FOND DE TROU, D'UN TUBE ENROULE

Publication

EP 0975853 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908080 A

Priority

  • US 9901875 W
  • US 7495198 P
  • US 9013898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941487A1] A downhole coiled tubing recovery apparatus (1) and method which utilizes vibration and resonant vibration in particular, to remove coiled tubing (38) and/or other objects which are stuck or jammed downhole in a well. In a preferred embodiment the coiled tubing recovery apparatus (1) includes an oscillating apparatus (22) suspended from a rig and fitted with a coiled tubing bail (2) for mounting the coiled tubing (28) and the method includes guiding the coiled tubing (28) from a reel (32) through the bail (2) and into and from an injector head (14) and the well, responsive to raising and lowering of the oscillating apparatus (22) and the tubing bail (2). One or more rod clamps (10) are typically used in connection with the coiled tubing bail (2) for manipulating the coiled tubing through the injector head (14) to and from the reel (32). In another embodiment of the invention the coiled tubing bail (2) is omitted and the coiled tubing is suspended directly from a fitting (16) attached to the oscillator (23) and extends through the injector head (14) into the well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 31/107; E21B 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/07 (2006.01); E21B 19/086 (2006.01); E21B 19/22 (2006.01); E21B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 31/005 (2013.01); E21B 19/07 (2013.01); E21B 19/086 (2013.01); E21B 19/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941487 A1 19990819; AU 2759699 A 19990830; CA 2286815 A1 19990819; CA 2286815 C 20051011; DE 69923812 D1 20050331; DE 69923812 T2 20060406; EP 0975853 A1 20000202; EP 0975853 A4 20020213; EP 0975853 B1 20050223; NO 319590 B1 20050829; NO 995028 A 19991216; NO 995028 D0 19991015

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923812

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-06-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923812 P 20050331

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL

2005-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENRY A. BERNAT

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2002-02-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 31/00 A, 7E 21B 19/08 B, 7E 21B 19/22 B, 7E 21B 28/00 B

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991112

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL