Global Patent Index - EP 0975856 A1

EP 0975856 A1 2000-02-02 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE LIFT VALVE

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE LIFT VALVE

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR WENIGSTENS EIN HUBVENTIL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR AU MOINS UNE SOUPAPE DE CYLINDRE

Publication

EP 0975856 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98917027 A

Priority

  • DE 19716042 A
  • EP 9801630 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716042C1] The invention relates to a hydraulic control device for a lift valve (1), comprising a valve stem (2) which can be moved by means of two spring elements working against each other and which can be controlled hydraulically in the area of its end positions. According to the invention, the hydraulic control device contains a spring element (20, 23) which can be regulated hydraulically. A hydraulically active auxiliary control element (37, 40, 41) by which means the work fluid of the hydraulically regulated spring element (20, 43) can be relieved of pressure, is also allocated to said spring element (20, 43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848151A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716042 C1 19980507; EP 0975856 A1 20000202; EP 0975856 B1 20011219; JP 2000515605 A 20001121; JP 3348201 B2 20021120; US 6167853 B1 20010102; WO 9848151 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802536

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070320

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802536 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LIFT VALVE AND HYDRAULICAL CONTROL DEVICE THEREFOR

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990911

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT