Global Patent Index - EP 0975857 A1

EP 0975857 A1 2000-02-02 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0975857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965239 A

Priority

  • DE 19756342 A
  • EP 9807987 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756342A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling an internal combustion engine, comprising an engine control device, electromagnetic valve actuators and other actuators, whereby each cylinder head has a separate actuator control device, which are connected to the engine control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F02D 2400/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932764A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756342 A1 19990701; DE 19756342 C2 20030213; EP 0975857 A1 20000202; EP 0975857 B1 20030409; JP 2001512551 A 20010821; US 6278932 B1 20010821; WO 9932764 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131209

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-09-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-08-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100729 AND 20100804

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-07-04 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2004-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FEV MOTORENTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990526

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT