Global Patent Index - EP 0975858 A1

EP 0975858 A1 2000-02-02 - TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AN ADDITIONAL ENGINE-OIL LUBRICATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AN ADDITIONAL ENGINE-OIL LUBRICATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZWEI-TAKT-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ZUSÄTZLICHEM MOTORÖLSCHMIERSYSTEM

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A DEUX TEMPS POURVU D'UN SYSTEME SUPPLEMENTAIRE DE LUBRIFICATION PAR HUILE MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0975858 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906106 A

Priority

  • DE 19800788 A
  • EP 9900050 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800788A1] The invention relates to a two-stroke internal combustion engine (10) with an additional engine-oil lubricating system. The engine comprises a fuel tank (11) which can be filled with fuel through a fill opening. Said fill opening can be closed with a fuel tank filler cap (13). The invention also comprises an engine-oil reservoir (12) which can be filled with engine-oil through a fill opening. The fill opening can be closed with an engine-oil reservoir cap (14). A regular inspection of the oil level in the engine-oil reservoir (12) is encouraged by constructing both the fuel tank and oil reservoir (11, 12) with their respective caps (13, 14) in such a way that the attention of the operator is drawn to the engine-oil reservoir (12) when filling the fuel tank (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/04 (2006.01); F01M 11/10 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/10 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0491 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935377A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800788 A1 19990715; DE 19800788 C2 20020627; EP 0975858 A1 20000202; EP 0975858 B1 20021016; JP 2001516423 A 20010925; US 6302078 B1 20011016; WO 9935377 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070107

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080108

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903083 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE