Global Patent Index - EP 0975865 A1

EP 0975865 A1 2000-02-02 - INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WORKING WITH FUEL/EMULSION

Title (en)

INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WORKING WITH FUEL/EMULSION

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOR FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE FÜR KRAFTSTOFF-/EMULSIONSBETRIEB

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR DE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE FONCTIONNANT AU CARBURANT-EMULSION

Publication

EP 0975865 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920523 A

Priority

  • DE 19715785 A
  • EP 9802192 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715785A1] The present invention relates to an injector for use in an internal combustion engine designed to work with fuel/emulsion. Two fuel inlet passages (10, 11), which are connected to a multichannel distributor (6) and used for feeding fuel from a high pressure hose (7), are linked with a mixing unit (5) surrounding the nozzle (1) needle (2). Downstream of the multichannel distributor (6), in the vicinity of the mixing unit (5), a make-up liquid inlet passage (9) is connected to a second fuel inlet passage (11) through which the make-up liquid, especially water, is fed to produce emulsified fuel. An amount of make-up liquid V, fed during a pause between two injections from the first make-up liquid (9) supply passage to the second fuel inlet passage (11), is entirely injected during the following injection phase by the high pressure fuel, supplied as a make-up fuel by a shift valve device, into the combustion chamber of the internal combustion engine, so that the second fuel inlet passage (11) and the fuel capacity (4, 5) of the injector are both entirely flushed by said make-up fuel, thereby preventing, during the working breaks of the internal combustion engine, any corrosion by water rests from the emulsion which might remain in the injector (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/03 (2006.01); F02M 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 43/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846875A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715785 A1 19981029; DE 19715785 C2 19991209; AT 214461 T 20020315; EP 0975865 A1 20000202; EP 0975865 B1 20020313; US 6223699 B1 20010501; WO 9846875 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070411

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803339 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214461 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT