Global patent index - EP 0975869 A1

EP 0975869 A1 2000-02-02 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A COMMON RAIL

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A COMMON RAIL

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT EINER COMMON-RAIL-SCHIENE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A SYSTEME D'INJECTION PAR ACCUMULATION DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0975869 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920531 A

Priority

  • DE 19716513 A
  • EP 9802228 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716513A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine, specially a diesel engine, comprising a crankcase (1) and cylinder heads. Said system is provided with injectors (36) to inject fuel into the combustion chambers of the internal combustion engine and a high pressure pump which supplies fuel to a common rail (3) supplying fuel to the injectors (36) via high pressure lines ( 5 and 7). According to the invention, the common rail (3) is lodged in or on the walls of the crankcase (1). This arrangement of the common rail track (3) and preferably also that of the fuel injectors (36) and the high pressure lines (5 and 7) in the housing of the internal combustion engine optimally protects the fuel injection system from external influence and damages while at the same time hermetically closing it from the outside by forming an internal leakage chamber (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; F02F 7/00; F02M 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 2200/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848165A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716513 A1 19981105; DE 19716513 C2 19990211; EP 0975869 A1 20000202; EP 0975869 B1 20020313; US 6237569 B1 20010529; WO 9848165 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803340

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990915

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT