Global Patent Index - EP 0975870 A1

EP 0975870 A1 2000-02-02 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE OR FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE OR FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL ODER BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT OU INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0975870 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932005 A

Priority

  • DE 9801159 W
  • DE 19726727 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726727A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection nozzle (1) or a fuel injection valve with a nozzle body (2) extending along a longitudinal axis (3). The valve seat surface (13) is configured on said body and interacts with a valve closing surface (15) arranged on the valve closing body (14) to from a valve seat. When the fuel injection valve or the fuel injection nozzle is open, at least one fuel jet (17) is injected having a radial directional component relative to the longitudinal axis (3) of the nozzle body (2). According to the invention, a sheath (4) is provided, which protrudes over axially above the fuel jet (17) in the direction of the longitudinal axis (3). The sheath (4) has an impact surface (19) which is impacted upon by the fuel jet (17). The impact surface (19) is slanted at a given angle ( alpha ) in relation to a vertical plane (20) which is vertical to the longitudinal axis (3) and/or the impact surface (19) is grooved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/06; F02M 61/08; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 13/00 (2006.01); F02M 57/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 57/06 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02M 61/1833 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859168A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726727 A1 19990107; EP 0975870 A1 20000202; EP 0975870 B1 20030910; JP 2000517030 A 20001219; KR 20000068296 A 20001125; US 6186419 B1 20010213; WO 9859168 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2005-06-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809574 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990630

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT