Global patent index - EP 0975920 A1

EP 0975920 A1 2000-02-02 - HEAT ENGINE

Title (en)

HEAT ENGINE

Title (de)

WÄRMEKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MOTEUR THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0975920 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925473 A

Priority

  • DE 19715918 A
  • DE 19729607 A
  • EP 9802161 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846947A1] The present invention relates to a device for heating a heat transfer medium, comprising a heating unit designed to generate a source of heat, a heat transfer area, a wall, e.g. a vessel wall or a pipe wall, between the source of heat ant the heat transfer area, as well as a selective layer on at least one side of the wall, which layer furthers the absorption by said wall of the calorific power from the source of heat and/or inhibits heat emission from said wall towards the source of heat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/00; F28F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/18 (2013.01); F24H 9/00 (2013.01); F24H 2240/00 (2013.01); F28F 2245/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846947A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846947 A1 19981022; AT 219569 T 20020715; AU 7758798 A 19981111; EP 0975920 A1 20000202; EP 0975920 B1 20020619

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-06-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-02-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-12-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-12-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-09-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804516

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-25

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219569

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE